SD SB66 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 664
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Specifically classify certain agricultural land as riparian buffer strips, to establish the criteria for the riparian buffer strip classification, and to provide for the taxation thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifically classify certain agricultural land as riparian buffer strips, to establish the criteria for the riparian buffer strip classification, and to provide for the taxation thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - House of Representatives - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House of Representatives - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09HouseSigned by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 664
2017-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 S.J. 626
2017-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 675
2017-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 563
2017-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 557
2017-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 539
2017-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 521
2017-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477
2017-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438
2017-02-16HouseTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 414
2017-02-16HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-09HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 362
2017-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 347
2017-02-06SenateDeferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 313
2017-02-02SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 267
2017-02-02SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. Amendment 66fb
2017-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-20SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 152

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=66&Session=2017
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB66P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB66SAG.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB66ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=22778&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=22781&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23059&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23380&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23797&Session=2017&Session=2017

Bill Comments

feedback