SD SB65 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create an exception to the dual compensation prohibition for state employees for military service.
Title
Create an exception to the dual compensation prohibition for state employees for military service.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 465 |
2021-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 508 |
2021-03-03 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-03-03 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 323 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 278 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 16 |