SD SB65 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2020 S.J. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 29-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2020 S.J. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions pertaining to trusts.
Title
Revise certain provisions pertaining to trusts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2020 S.J. 493 |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2020 S.J. 450 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 498 |
2020-03-04 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 421 |
2020-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 451 |
2020-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-02 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-02 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 411 |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading House H.J. 298 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 3. S.J. 231 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65A |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 62 |