SD SB65 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 S.J. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 S.J. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding drug deliveries that result in death and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding drug deliveries that result in death and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 S.J. 792 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 776 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 685 |
2018-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 669 |
2018-02-28 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 643 |
2018-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 437 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 449 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 417 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65ca |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 25 |