SD SB65 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Delivered Style and Form S.J. 628
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Delivered Style and Form S.J. 628
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the procedure for a municipal recall petition.
Title
Revise the procedure for a municipal recall petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House Approval of style and form veto (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Approval of style and form veto (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Approval of style and form veto (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Delivered Style and Form S.J. 628 |
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | Approval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 8. H.J. 883 |
2016-03-29 | House | Approval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 625 |
2016-03-29 | House | Vetoed for Style and Form S.J. 621 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 582 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 7. H.J. 801 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781 |
2016-03-01 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 732 |
2016-03-01 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65yb |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 262 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 181 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 146 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65sc |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65sb |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 104 |