SD SB65 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow nonpublic schools accredited by certain accrediting agencies other than the Department of Education to become members of the South Dakota High School Activities Association.
Title
Allow nonpublic schools accredited by certain accrediting agencies other than the Department of Education to become members of the South Dakota High School Activities Association.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] |
Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Rep. Steve Hickey [R] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Kraus [R] | Rep. Brian Liss [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] |
Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] |
Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] | Rep. Burt Tulson [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Rep. Hal Wick [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 682 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 663 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 8. H.J. 644 | |
2011-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 594 | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-09 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 338 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 363 | |
2011-02-03 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 311 | |
2011-02-03 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65cb | |
2011-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 163 |