SD SB62 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for eligible water, wastewater, storm water, and nonpoint source projects and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for eligible water, wastewater, storm water, and nonpoint source projects and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Referred as Amended to (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Referred as Amended to (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2022 S.J. 495 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 635 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 488 |
2022-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 606 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 465 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 332 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 239 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 62B |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Procurement of Public Improvements
Water Management
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Procurement of Public Improvements
Water Management