SD SB62 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2021 S.J. 300
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding appeals by the prosecution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding appeals by the prosecution.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateSigned by the Governor on February 22, 2021 S.J. 300
2021-02-16SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 16, 2021 S.J. 258
2021-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 288
2021-02-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 242
2021-02-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 255
2021-02-08HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-08HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2021-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 179
2021-02-01SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 147
2021-01-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137
2021-01-27SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 125
2021-01-26SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2
2021-01-26SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-01-26SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 15

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback