SD SB62 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 16. S.J. 238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 16. S.J. 238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the use of certain general funds to increase Medicaid reimbursement rates for existing Medicaid providers.
Title
Provide for the use of certain general funds to increase Medicaid reimbursement rates for existing Medicaid providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 16. S.J. 238 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 238 Amendment 62jb |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 211 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 197 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 139 |