SD SB62 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 S.J. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the notification related to a breach of certain data and to provide a penalty therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the notification related to a breach of certain data and to provide a penalty therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2018 S.J. 792
2018-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 780
2018-03-09HouseSigned by the President S.J. 777
2018-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 790
2018-03-08HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 758
2018-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 742
2018-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 719 Amendment Cc62a
2018-03-07HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 739 Amendment cc62a
2018-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 693
2018-03-05HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 690
2018-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 627
2018-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 611
2018-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 592
2018-02-21HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 517
2018-02-21HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 62ja
2018-02-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 224
2018-01-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 252
2018-01-25SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 252 Amendment 62ca
2018-01-23SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 193
2018-01-23SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 62wb
2018-01-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-18SenateDeferred by Chair
2018-01-18SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-16SenateDeferred by Chair
2018-01-16SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 62wa
2018-01-16SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-09SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=62&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB62P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB62SJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB62S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB62HJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB62CNF.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB62ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24749&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24930&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24749&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24930&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26091&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26478&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26862&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26879&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback