SD SB60 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-7)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 S.J. 559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-7)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 S.J. 559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Physical Therapist Licensure Compact.
Title
Adopt the Physical Therapist Licensure Compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 S.J. 559 |
2020-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2020 S.J. 474 |
2020-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2020-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 469 |
2020-03-03 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-03 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 410 |
2020-02-12 | House | First Reading House H.J. 271 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 191 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 60A |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 57 |