SD SB6 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 S.J. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 S.J. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to prohibited conduct by schools and landlords related to medical cannabis.
Title
Revise provisions related to prohibited conduct by schools and landlords related to medical cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 S.J. 489 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2022 S.J. 423 |
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 495 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 400 |
2022-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 468 |
2022-02-23 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 325 |
2022-02-08 | House | First Reading House H.J. 236 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 194 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 170 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 138 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 10 |