SD SB6 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 S.J. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 S.J. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Correct technical errors in statutory cross-references related to the Department of Social Services.
Title
Correct technical errors in statutory cross-references related to the Department of Social Services.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 S.J. 286 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 235 |
2021-02-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 257 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 218 |
2021-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 226 |
2021-02-04 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-04 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 130 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 103 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 14 |