SD SB57 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Signed by the President S.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the provisions regarding the South Dakota state employee health plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the provisions regarding the South Dakota state employee health plan.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateSigned by the President S.J. 422
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 468
2021-03-01HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseReferred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 279
2021-02-04HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 213
2021-02-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 173
2021-02-01SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 141
2021-01-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137
2021-01-27SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 1
2021-01-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback