SD SB57 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 S.J. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain references regarding the contractor's excise tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain references regarding the contractor's excise tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseSigned by the Governor on February 5, 2018 S.J. 380
2018-02-01HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 01, 2018 S.J. 317
2018-01-31HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 266
2018-01-25HouseSigned by the President S.J. 260
2018-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 182
2018-01-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-01-23HouseTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 142
2018-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-17HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 79
2018-01-16SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 100
2018-01-12SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-01-12SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 62
2018-01-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-09SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=57&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB57P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB57ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24461&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24499&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24745&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24856&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24461&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24499&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24745&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24856&Session=2018

Bill Comments 750

feedback