SD SB57 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 9, 2017 S.J. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the operation of a nursing home facility in Eagle Butte, South Dakota, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the operation of a nursing home facility in Eagle Butte, South Dakota, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-09HouseSigned by the Governor on February 9, 2017 S.J. 363
2017-02-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 07, 2017 S.J. 323
2017-02-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 314
2017-02-03HouseSigned by the President S.J. 302
2017-02-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 281
2017-02-01HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 255
2017-01-31HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 222
2017-01-31HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 195
2017-01-24SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 188
2017-01-23SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 160
2017-01-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 59

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback