SD SB57 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Redefine the term, written agreement, relating to contracts between a debtor and creditor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redefine the term, written agreement, relating to contracts between a debtor and creditor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07HouseSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538
2016-03-02HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 02, 2016 S.J. 500
2016-03-01HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 744
2016-02-29HouseSigned by the President S.J. 481
2016-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 0. H.J. 702
2016-02-24HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2016-02-24HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 658
2016-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 220
2016-01-27SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 152
2016-01-26SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2016-01-26SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 136
2016-01-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-01-21SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 102

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback