SD SB57 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 662
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize and regulate the playing of craps, roulette, and keno within the city limits of the city of Deadwood.
Title
Authorize and regulate the playing of craps, roulette, and keno within the city limits of the city of Deadwood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 662 |
2015-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 578 |
2015-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 581 |
2015-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 552 |
2015-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 22. H.J. 546 |
2015-02-25 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 508 |
2015-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 327 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 307 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 280 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 27 |