SD SB57 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal certain provisions regarding the regulation of the trading stamp business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal certain provisions regarding the regulation of the trading stamp business.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-10HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 264
2014-02-06HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 234
2014-02-05HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 302
2014-02-04HouseSigned by President S.J. 213
2014-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 253
2014-01-30HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-01-30HouseTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 172
2014-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 105
2014-01-23SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 99
2014-01-22SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-01-22SenateTaxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 90
2014-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-15SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 38

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback