SD SB57 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise and repeal certain administrative rules relating to the South Dakota Housing Development Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise and repeal certain administrative rules relating to the South Dakota Housing Development Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-01 Signed by Governor S.J. 640
2012-02-23 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 533
2012-02-22 Signed by Speaker H.J. 559
2012-02-21 Signed by President S.J. 491
2012-02-16 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 507
2012-02-15 Placed on consent, Passed
2012-02-15 State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 480
2012-02-15 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-24 First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 179
2012-01-23 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 145
2012-01-20 State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 93
2012-01-20 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-10 First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback