SD SB57 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the investment fee rate for certain employers and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the investment fee rate for certain employers and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 0 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-28 Delivered to the Secretary of State S.J. 708
2011-03-28 Veto override, Failed, YEAS 0, NAYS 34. S.J. 704
2011-03-28 Vetoed by the Governor S.J. 702
2011-03-08 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 645
2011-03-07 Signed by Speaker H.J. 652
2011-03-03 Signed by President S.J. 616
2011-03-02 House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 607
2011-03-01 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 584
2011-02-28 Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 544
2011-02-28 Scheduled for hearing
2011-01-27 First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 197
2011-01-26 Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 216 Amendment 57fta
2011-01-26 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 216
2011-01-26 Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 215 Amendment 57fa
2011-01-25 Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 190
2011-01-25 Scheduled for hearing
2011-01-20 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 150

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback