SD SB57 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 578
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 578
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the time frames for issuing a decision in certain electric service area disputes and adequacy of service complaints.
Title
Revise the time frames for issuing a decision in certain electric service area disputes and adequacy of service complaints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 578 | |
2010-03-03 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 542 | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 664 | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 500 | |
2010-02-25 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 616 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 597 | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 350 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 263 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 250 | |
2010-02-02 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 211 | |
2010-02-02 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 57oa | |
2010-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate Commerce, Passed S.J. 113 | |
2010-01-19 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 76 | |
2010-01-19 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 57jb | |
2010-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 24 |