SD SB56 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2022 S.J. 495 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 635 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 479 |
2022-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 582 |
2022-03-01 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 3, NAYS 1. |
2022-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 223 |
2022-02-01 | House | First Reading House H.J. 167 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 141 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 16 |