SD SB54 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2020 S.J. 378
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Regulate the use of auxiliary containers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulate the use of auxiliary containers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseSigned by the Governor on February 27, 2020 S.J. 378
2020-02-21HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 S.J. 302
2020-02-20HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 340
2020-02-19HouseSigned by the President S.J. 259
2020-02-18HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 24. H.J. 296
2020-02-18HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 20. H.J. 295
2020-02-13HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 281
2020-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 33. H.J. 281
2020-02-12HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2.
2020-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-04HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 118
2020-01-30SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 12. S.J. 122
2020-01-28SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2.
2020-01-28SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 54D
2020-01-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-21SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 56

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=54&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/62719.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/64356.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/67863.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32112&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32119&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32268&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32920&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33075&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33153&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33154&Session=2020

Bill Comments 750

feedback