SD SB54 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for the payment of extraordinary litigation expenses and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for the payment of extraordinary litigation expenses and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseSigned by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
2018-03-01HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 01, 2018 S.J. 660
2018-02-28HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 653
2018-02-27HouseSigned by the President S.J. 623
2018-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 4. H.J. 608
2018-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 592
2018-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 565
2018-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 539
2018-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 501
2018-02-15HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 480
2018-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 462
2018-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 430
2018-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 413
2018-02-08HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 391
2018-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 382
2018-02-06HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 358
2018-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 9. S.J. 375
2018-02-02SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. S.J. 342
2018-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-09SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 22

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback