SD SB54 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding campaign finance requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding campaign finance requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor on March 14, 2017 S.J. 747
2017-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
2017-03-10HouseSigned by the President S.J. 744
2017-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 759
2017-03-10HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 739
2017-03-10HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 736 Amendment Cc54a
2017-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 755
2017-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 752 Amendment Cc54a
2017-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 716
2017-03-08HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 679
2017-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 695
2017-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 693 Amendment 54fx
2017-03-06HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 623
2017-03-06HouseState Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 54fs
2017-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 535
2017-02-23SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 16. S.J. 546
2017-02-23SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 532 Amendment 54fp
2017-02-22SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 468
2017-02-22SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54fh
2017-02-22SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. Amendment 54fi
2017-02-22SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54oa
2017-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-15SenateDeferred by Chair
2017-02-15SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. Amendment 54ff
2017-02-15SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. Amendment 54fg
2017-02-15SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. Amendment 54fd
2017-02-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-13SenateState Affairs Deferred to another day, Passed
2017-02-13SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54fb
2017-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-11SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 47

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=54&Session=2017
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB54P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB54SST.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB54S.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB54HST.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB54H.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB54CNF.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB54ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23361&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23362&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23367&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23544&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23548&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23663&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24057&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24180&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24323&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24322&Session=2017&Session=2017

Bill Comments 750

feedback