SD SB54 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2016 S.J. 615
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Elder Abuse Task Force's statutory recommendations in order to protect South Dakota seniors and adults with disabilities from abuse, neglect, and exploitation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Elder Abuse Task Force's statutory recommendations in order to protect South Dakota seniors and adults with disabilities from abuse, neglect, and exploitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2016 S.J. 615
2016-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 S.J. 585
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 845
2016-03-08HouseSigned by the President S.J. 577
2016-03-07HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 542
2016-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 8. H.J. 763
2016-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 743
2016-02-29HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 723
2016-02-24HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 657
2016-02-24HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54ra
2016-02-24HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54rb
2016-02-24HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-02-04HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 292
2016-02-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 203
2016-02-02SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 175
2016-01-28SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 158
2016-01-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-01-26SenateDeferred by Chair
2016-01-19SenateDeferred by Chair
2016-01-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-01-14SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 46

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback