SD SB54 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the state aid to special education formula and to revise the property tax levies for special education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the state aid to special education formula and to revise the property tax levies for special education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 60 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 736
2015-03-13HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 731
2015-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 785
2015-03-13HouseSigned by President S.J. 726
2015-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 4. H.J. 749
2015-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 740 Amendment cc54a
2015-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 699
2015-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 690 Amendment Cc54a
2015-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 727
2015-03-11HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 668
2015-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 689
2015-03-09HouseAppropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 655
2015-03-09HouseAppropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54na
2015-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-03-03HouseDeferred by Chair
2015-02-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 516
2015-02-24SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 492
2015-02-20SenateAppropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 463
2015-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-30SenateDeferred by Chair
2015-01-30SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-13SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 26

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=54&Session=2015
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB54P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB54HAP.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB54CNF.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB54ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=18878&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=18990&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19579&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19676&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19823&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19844&Session=2015

Bill Comments 750

feedback