SD SB54 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the definition of a boat dealer, used vehicle dealer, and dealer of mobile homes or manufactured homes, and to revise certain penalties for selling motor vehicles, snowmobiles, mobile homes, manufactured homes, or boats without a license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the definition of a boat dealer, used vehicle dealer, and dealer of mobile homes or manufactured homes, and to revise certain penalties for selling motor vehicles, snowmobiles, mobile homes, manufactured homes, or boats without a license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-10HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 580
2014-03-04HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 528
2014-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 621
2014-02-27HouseSigned by President S.J. 501
2014-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 581
2014-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 545
2014-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 516
2014-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 493
2014-02-20HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 466
2014-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 398
2014-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 297
2014-02-07SenateTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 252
2014-02-07SenateTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 54fa
2014-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-29SenateReferred to Senate Transportation S.J. 157
2014-01-15SenateFirst read in Senate S.J. 38

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback