SD SB54 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-20 - No motion to reconsider S.J. 95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the circumstances under which motor vehicle headlamps must be dimmed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the circumstances under which motor vehicle headlamps must be dimmed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-20 No motion to reconsider S.J. 95
2012-01-19 Intent to reconsider S.J. 84
2012-01-19 Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 16. S.J. 84
2012-01-13 Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 71
2012-01-12 Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 50
2012-01-10 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback