SD SB53 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Department of Corrections to purchase certain real property and contract for design of a community work center for offenders committed to the Department of Corrections, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Department of Corrections to purchase certain real property and contract for design of a community work center for offenders committed to the Department of Corrections, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Reconsidered (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Do Not Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Referred as Amended to (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Reconsidered (Y: 49 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Do Not Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Referred as Amended to (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 542 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 S.J. 539 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 538 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 19. H.J. 661 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 516 |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 53K |
2022-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 650 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 500 |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 21. H.J. 534 |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 534 Amendment 53H |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 18. H.J. 533 Amendment 53G |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 19. H.J. 532 |
2022-03-02 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 529 |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 45, NAYS 23. H.J. 529 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 21. H.J. 518 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Not Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass H.J. 1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 465 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 331 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 331 Amendment 53D |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 239 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 53C |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 53A |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 10 |