SD SB53 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the bank franchise tax.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the bank franchise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Taxation Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596 |
2016-03-03 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 03, 2016 S.J. 516 |
2016-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 767 |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 496 |
2016-02-29 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 718 |
2016-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 706 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 687 |
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 650 |
2016-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622 |
2016-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 470 |
2016-02-18 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 430 |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 164 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 120 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 83 |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. Amendment 53fc |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. Amendment 53fb |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 24 |