SD SB53 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for the construction and renovation of a combined minimum security and parole facility in Rapid City and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for the construction and renovation of a combined minimum security and parole facility in Rapid City and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Signed by Governor S.J. 673 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 784 | |
2010-03-03 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. H.J. 738 | |
2010-03-03 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-19 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 492 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 371 | |
2010-02-17 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 345 | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 23 |