SD SB51 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to a previous appropriation for renovation of the nursing care building on the South Dakota Veterans' Home campus and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to a previous appropriation for renovation of the nursing care building on the South Dakota Veterans' Home campus and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 557 | |
2011-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 537 | |
2011-02-24 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 508 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-09 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 337 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 362 | |
2011-02-03 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 313 | |
2011-02-03 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 51oa | |
2011-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 24 |