SD SB50 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 S.J. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the practice of a certified registered nurse anesthetist.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the practice of a certified registered nurse anesthetist.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseSigned by the Governor on February 26, 2020 S.J. 363
2020-02-21HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 S.J. 302
2020-02-20HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 340
2020-02-19HouseSigned by the President S.J. 259
2020-02-18HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 237
2020-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 272
2020-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 272 Amendment 50L
2020-02-11HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2020-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 58
2020-01-23SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 69
2020-01-23SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 68 Amendment 50C
2020-01-22SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2020-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-16SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 33

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=50&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/62427.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/63549.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/67609.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/67853.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=31629&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=31935&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32779&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32963&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33151&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback