SD SB49 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise property tax levies for school districts and to revise the state aid to general and special education formulas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise property tax levies for school districts and to revise the state aid to general and special education formulas.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Recommend Referral to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 492
2021-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 567
2021-03-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 488
2021-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 565
2021-03-11HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 564
2021-03-11HousePlaced on calendar, Passed H.J. 564
2021-03-10JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 2.
2021-03-10JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-03-09JointScheduled for hearing
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 200
2021-01-19SenateEducation Recommend Referral to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-01-19SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback