SD SB49 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to purchase unimproved agricultural real property in Brookings County, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to purchase unimproved agricultural real property in Brookings County, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2018 S.J. 476 |
2018-02-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2018 S.J. 417 |
2018-02-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382 |
2018-02-06 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 394 |
2018-02-05 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 365 |
2018-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 301 Amendment 49zta |
2018-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 301 |
2018-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 301 Amendment 49za |
2018-01-31 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 253 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 278 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. S.J. 239 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 21 |