SD SB49 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain fees collected by the secretary of state to make an appropriation for an online business registration and filing system, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise certain fees collected by the secretary of state to make an appropriation for an online business registration and filing system, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 827 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805 |
2016-03-03 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 777 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 507 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 49me |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 63 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 23 |