SD SB49 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Department of Game, Fish and Parks to sell a portion of railway right-of-way to the City of Deadwood.
Title
Authorize the Department of Game, Fish and Parks to sell a portion of railway right-of-way to the City of Deadwood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2015-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 619 |
2015-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 |
2015-03-04 | House | Signed by President S.J. 590 |
2015-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 576 |
2015-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557 |
2015-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 549 |
2015-02-25 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 508 |
2015-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 287 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 271 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 25 |