SD SB46 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - Signed by the Governor on February 04, 2022 S.J. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-04 - Signed by the Governor on February 04, 2022 S.J. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Protect fairness in women's sports.
Title
Protect fairness in women's sports.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Table amendment (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Table amendment (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 04, 2022 S.J. 178 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 03, 2022 S.J. 172 |
2022-02-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 199 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 156 |
2022-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 17. H.J. 169 |
2022-02-01 | House | Table amendment, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 168 |
2022-01-27 | House | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed H.J. 149 |
2022-01-26 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2022-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 47 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 77 |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 76 Amendment 46C |
2022-01-14 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 1 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 46A |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16 |
Subjects
Athletics
Colleges and Universities
Education
Executive/Judiciary Request
Higher Education
Liability
School Districts
Schools
Colleges and Universities
Education
Executive/Judiciary Request
Higher Education
Liability
School Districts
Schools