SD SB46 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that the state treasurer shall receive certain cost penalties in certain alcoholic beverage cases.
Title
Provide that the state treasurer shall receive certain cost penalties in certain alcoholic beverage cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 547 | |
2011-02-25 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 529 | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 132 | |
2011-01-20 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 152 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 142 | |
2011-01-18 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-18 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 80 | |
2011-01-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 23 |