SD SB45 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions relating to the sale of unpasteurized raw milk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions relating to the sale of unpasteurized raw milk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 688
2015-03-06HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 619
2015-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 621
2015-03-04HouseSigned by President S.J. 590
2015-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 572
2015-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557
2015-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 549
2015-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 529
2015-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 503
2015-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 471
2015-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 458
2015-02-18HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
2015-02-17HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 418
2015-02-12HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 395
2015-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 250
2015-01-29SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 237
2015-01-27SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 181
2015-01-27SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. Amendment 45fc
2015-01-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-13SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback