SD SB45 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the Real Estate Commission's grounds for disciplinary actions on home inspectors.
Title
Revise the Real Estate Commission's grounds for disciplinary actions on home inspectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 |
2014-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 660 |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by President S.J. 540 |
2014-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 6. H.J. 613 |
2014-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 594 |
2014-02-26 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 566 |
2014-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 122 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 115 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 94 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 36 |