SD SB45 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the requirement to prepare a report on extending health insurance to medically uninsurable individuals who are not part of a small employer group.
Title
Repeal the requirement to prepare a report on extending health insurance to medically uninsurable individuals who are not part of a small employer group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 | |
2011-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 548 | |
2011-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 505 | |
2011-02-22 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 448 | |
2011-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-16 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 413 | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 131 | |
2011-01-20 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 152 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 142 | |
2011-01-18 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-18 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 80 | |
2011-01-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 23 |