SD SB44 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the use of crime victims' compensation funds to reimburse law enforcement for certain emergency expenses incurred for victims.
Title
Authorize the use of crime victims' compensation funds to reimburse law enforcement for certain emergency expenses incurred for victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 507 |
2020-03-04 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-04 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 59 |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading House H.J. 50 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 63 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 17 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 14 |