SD SB44 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 20, 2019 S.J. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the permanent endowment trust, to authorize the Board of Regents to sell certain extraneous real property and to purchase certain real property, to make an appropriation of sale proceeds, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the permanent endowment trust, to authorize the Board of Regents to sell certain extraneous real property and to purchase certain real property, to make an appropriation of sale proceeds, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseSigned by the Governor on February 20, 2019 S.J. 440
2019-02-19HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 19, 2019 S.J. 398
2019-02-14HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 423
2019-02-13HouseSigned by the President S.J. 373
2019-02-12HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 344
2019-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 333
2019-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 333 Amendment 44ja
2019-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 311
2019-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 301
2019-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283
2019-01-30HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 273
2019-01-29HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 235
2019-01-28SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 202
2019-01-25SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 2. S.J. 179
2019-01-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 29

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback