SD SB44 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a license for certain gaming equipment manufacturers and distributors and to establish a license fee.
Title
Establish a license for certain gaming equipment manufacturers and distributors and to establish a license fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756 |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2018 S.J. 736 |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689 |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 646 |
2018-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 10. H.J. 622 |
2018-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 603 |
2018-02-23 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 568 |
2018-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 78 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 101 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 62 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 20 |