SD SB44 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 15. H.J. 711
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 15. H.J. 711
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create a provider revolving loan fund for skilled nursing facilities in the Department of Social Services, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Create a provider revolving loan fund for skilled nursing facilities in the Department of Social Services, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 15. H.J. 711 |
2014-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 685 |
2014-03-05 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. H.J. 643 |
2014-03-05 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 44aa |
2014-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 574 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 463 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 463 Amendment 44ha |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 422 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 44ma |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Appropriations, Passed S.J. 109 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 107 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 36 |