SD SB43 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 S.J. 559
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the South Dakota Building Authority to issue revenue bonds to provide for maintenance and repair on facilities controlled by the Board of Regents and to provide appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the South Dakota Building Authority to issue revenue bonds to provide for maintenance and repair on facilities controlled by the Board of Regents and to provide appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseSigned by the Governor on March 26, 2020 S.J. 559
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 581
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the President S.J. 475
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 18. H.J. 506
2020-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 495
2020-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 469
2020-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 404
2020-03-02SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 2.
2020-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 17
2020-01-14SenateFirst Reading Senate S.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback