SD SB43 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the unemployment insurance penalty for failure to pay contributions or make reports.
Title
Increase the unemployment insurance penalty for failure to pay contributions or make reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 43 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Removed from table (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 43 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Removed from table (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 15, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 16. H.J. 838 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 25. H.J. 837 |
2016-03-08 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 827 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 43, NAYS 23. H.J. 826 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805 |
2016-03-03 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 777 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 509 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 3. S.J. 485 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 5. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. S.J. 450 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 62 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 22 |